Smullin v. Duncan et al

Plaintiff: Ronald DeWayne Smullin
Defendant: Brett Duncan, Author Bentley and Chasity Jackson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00158
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 132 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/1/2016. (jak)
April 25, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Smullin an opportunity to file a response opposing the motion, 114 . To be considered, the response must be filed within fourteen days of this Order. If Mr. Smullin files a response, he must also file a separate, short statement setting for the disputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/25/2016. (jak)
March 29, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion to Vacate ; denying 95 Motion to Amend; denying 99 Motion for Order. If this case is set for a hearing or trial, Mr. Smullin will have an opportunity to call witnesses on his behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/29/2016. (jak)
February 23, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Mr. Smullin's motion 78 as a supplement to his amended complaint. Mr. Smullin's motion for ruling, 87 , is denied as moot. His motion for court-appointed counsel 88 is denied for reasons previously explained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/23/2016. (jak)
January 13, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Compel; denying 79 Motion for Ruling as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/13/2016. (jak)
December 18, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting part and denying in part 62 Motion for a Protective Order. With the exception of the discovery requests that Mr. Smullin sought permission to serve, after each Defendant has responded to twenty-five of Mr. Smullin's discover y requests, they are not obligated to respond to any other discovery requests propounded on them. The County Defendants have an additional fourteen days to respond to Mr. Smullin's motion to compel. Motion to strike, 59 , denied. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to file docket entry 46 as an addendum to Mr. Smullin's amended complaint. 64 Second motion for protective order and 66 Motion to continue interrogatories are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/18/2015. (jak)
October 15, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue a summons for Mr. Duncan. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and the amended complaint, 1 & 16 , with any attachments, and the summons, upon Mr. Duncan at the address provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/15/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/2015. (jak)
September 3, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Mr. Smullin's motion, 12 , as his amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Andy Allison, Officer Peaster, Matt Hall, She riff Marty Boyd, and Gary Etter. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and a summons for each of these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Mr. Smullin's motion for Court-appointed counsel, 13 , is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/3/2015. (jak)
June 11, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order. You must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/11/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smullin v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald DeWayne Smullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Author Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?