Addison v. Martin

Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison
Defendant: Joey Martin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00164
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $1.78. Addison's custodian will collect this initial fee even if Addison's account balance is less than $10.00. After the initial fee is collected, all future custodians s hall collect monthly payments from Addison's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the $505 appellate filing and docketing fees are paid in full. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/12/2015. (jak)
August 11, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Addison's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2015. (jak)
August 4, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Addison desires to pay the filing and administrative fees in this case but doesn't know how, 11 . Addison must send the Clerk of Court a check or money order for $400. The payment must be made payable to the Clerk of Court. The Court grants Addison until 17 August 2015 to pay. The Court will hold the pending recommended disposition, 10 , until then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?