In The Matter of Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation et al

Claimant: Estate of Nicholas Perez Hernandez, Cecelia Hernandez Lopez and Kassandra Nieves
Counter_defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation and GATX Third Aircraft LLC
Counter_claimant: Kassandra Nieves
Case Number: 3:2015cv00170
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Kinder Morgan Energy Partners and Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals' motions for summary judgment, document number 98 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and document number 84 in case number 3:15-cv-00350. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/2016. (jak)
October 28, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The motions for extension of time filed by LSI, SDI Columbus, and Cooper Marine are granted. Documents 100, 101, and 102 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and Documents 87, 88, and 89 in case 3:15-cv-00350. These parties have until seven days after the Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of thirdparty defendants Dawson and Temps Plus are completed to file their responses to KMEP and Kinder Morgan's motions for summary judgment, Documents 98 & 84. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/2016. (jak)
October 21, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: These cases are scheduled for trial beginning 4/3/2017 and 4/24/2017. The motions for continuance are granted; Document number 96 in case 3:15-cv-00225 and document number 83 in case 3:15-cv-00350. Case No. 3:15-cv-00225 is removed from the t rial docket for the week of 4/3/2017. Case No. 3:15-cv-00350 is removed from the trial docket for the week of 4/24/2017. The scheduling orders in those cases are hereby set aside. New scheduling orders will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/21/2016. (jak)
September 2, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the request for a stay. The deposition may not be conducted until the Court rules on the motion for protective order. Plaintiff's are directed to file their response to the motion for protective order as promptly as possible. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/2016. (jak)
January 20, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the joint motion to consolidate these three actions for discovery purposes only. Case No. 3:15-cv-00170-JLH will be the lead case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Nicholas Perez Hernandez
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Brent Probinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cecelia Hernandez Lopez
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kassandra Nieves
Represented By: Erica F. Blume
Represented By: Timothy M. Cronin
Represented By: Scott Hubert Fruge'
Represented By: John Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Hoerner
Represented By: Andre' J. Mouledoux
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: GATX Third Aircraft LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Hoerner
Represented By: Andre' J. Mouledoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kassandra Nieves
Represented By: Erica F. Blume
Represented By: Timothy M. Cronin
Represented By: Scott Hubert Fruge'
Represented By: John Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?