Addison v. Martin

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Joey Martin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00175
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Addison's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2015. (jak)
August 11, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Addison to send the Clerk of Court a check or money order for $400. The payment must be made payable to the Clerk of Court. The Court grants Addison until 24 August 2015 to pay. The Court will hold the pending recommended disposition, 10 , until then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/11/2015. (jak)
June 19, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Denying 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to pay the fee will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?