Love v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Joe Love
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2015cv00179
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees totaling $1,839.52 awarded to Love. The Department of Treasury shall issue payment of this award by check made payable to Love, in care of the Bartels Law Firm, and shall mail the check to the Bartels Law Firm at its Jonesboro, Arkansas address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/5/2016. (jak)
June 24, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 MOTION. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to strike the name of Anthony W. Bartels as the attorney of record for Love. The Clerk of the Court shall enter the name of Stephanie Bartels Wallace as the new attorney of record for Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/24/2016. (jak)
April 21, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 15 Order, this case is remanded for further proceedings. This is a "sentence four" remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/21/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Love
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?