Moss v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Andrew Moss
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00200
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 19 Motion, granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion, and denying as moot 30 Motion. The 9 Final Scheduling Order is suspended and the 2/13/2017 trial is canceled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/21/2016. (jak)
December 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Moss's responses to the pending motions, 19 & 22 , are overdue. Unless he responds by 12/16/2016, the Court will consider the motions unopposed and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2016. (jak)
March 11, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/11/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moss
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Kent B. Hanson
Represented By: Dale H. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?