Patterson v. Stein et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Patterson
Defendant: John H Stein, Jr, Larry W Winkler and Smith Transportation Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv00207
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 MOTION to Continue. This case will be removed from the trial calendar for the week of September 19, 2016. An Amended Final Scheduling Order, along with a new trial date, will be entered by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/29/2016. (jak)
March 16, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss Party. Mr. Patterson failed to state a claim against Mr. Winkler and failed to allege sufficient facts establishing that this Court has personal jurisdiction over Mr. Winkler. Therefore, the Coach grants Mr. Winkler's motion to dismiss Mr. Patterson's claims against him. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/16/2016 (jak)
August 27, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate cases. The Patterson case, 3:15-cv-00207, shall be consolidated with and into the Stringer case, 3:14-cv-00151. All parties are directed to make filings only in Stringer v. Smith Transportation, et al., Case No. 3:14-cv-00151-KGB, going forward. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Stein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Patterson
Represented By: Shannon D. Elsea
Represented By: Blake P. Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Stein, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry W Winkler
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Transportation Inc
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?