Hodges et al v. Allen

Plaintiff: Angelo Hodges and Michael W Jones
Defendant: Mike Allen
Case Number: 3:2015cv00239
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/2016. (jak)
January 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed partial recommendation, 30 , adopted. Hodges's claims against Allen are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2016. (jak)
December 17, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for Defendant Officer Worth. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendant and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the second amended complaint, 27 , and summons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/17/2015. (jak)
November 17, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jones hasn't responded to the Court's 13 October 2015 Order, 15 . Jones's claims are therefore dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2015. (jak)
October 7, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 7 Order. The Court directs the Clerk to reinstate Jones as a party. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2015. (jak)
September 28, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jones hasn't filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $400 filing and administrative fees; and the time to do so has passed. Jones's claims are therefore dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 09/26/2015. (rhm)
August 20, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Jones to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis application within thirty days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff Jones and IFP Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges et al v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?