GE Capital Commercial Inc v. Bland Family Farms LLC et al

Plaintiff: GE Capital Commercial Inc
Defendant: Bland Family Farms LLC, Sarah Bland and Jamey Bland
Case Number: 3:2015cv00247
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Substitute Party. BMO Harris Bank N.A. is substituted for GE Capital Commercial Inc. The Court waives the notice-of-hearing requirement. No hearing is needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
March 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion to Substitute. First, BMO Harris Bank is not a party. Second, the proof of assignment needs shoring up. The Court will schedule a hearing, if one is needed, in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2016. (jak)
December 28, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 12 Motion for Attorney Fees. The time spent, and work done, was reasonable. The hourly rates, though, are more than normally charged in this District for this kind of work. The Court therefore reduces the hourly rates to $300 for Ziegenhorn, $225 for Jones, and $150 for Burgett. The approved total is $12,480 in fees. The Court awards $13,050 to GE Capital against Bland Family Farms, Sarah Bland, and Jamey Bland for attorney's fees and expenses reasonably incurred in collecting the debt. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2015. (jak)
December 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT for GE Capital against Bland Family Farms, Sarah Bland, and Jamey Bland, jointly and severally, for $520,830.89, plus a reasonable attorney's fee and costs as the Court may later award. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.51% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GE Capital Commercial Inc v. Bland Family Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GE Capital Commercial Inc
Represented By: Justin Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Gay Ziegenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland Family Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamey Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?