Allen v. Lawrence et al

Plaintiff: Steven Marquell Deshun Allen
Defendant: Lawrence, Craighead County Detention Center, Crittenden County and Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2015cv00248
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct defendants' names to "Arthur Bentley" and "Chassity Jackson". Plaintiff must file on or before 10/19/2016 a response to Defendant Bentley's and Jackson's motion for summary judg ment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply this Order will result in either all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c) or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/19/2016. (jak)
July 5, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff another copy of the Authorization Form, 64 , Exhibit A at 10. Plaintiff must complete, sign, and file the Authorization Form on or before July 19, 2016. If he does not, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Defendants must complete discovery on or before August 18, 2016. Defendants must file any dispositive motions on or before September 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/5/2016. (jak)
May 19, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: All claims against Defendant Loren Lawrence are dismissed with prejudice because she is deceased, 31 , and Allen has not moved for substitution. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/19/2016. (jak)
May 17, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must file, on or before May 27, 2016, his Answers to Defendants' January 18, 2016 Interrogatories and Requests for Production. If he does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/17/2016. (jak)
February 16, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file on or before March 17, 2016, a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If he does not do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/16/2016. (jak)
February 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER concluding there is no basis for imposing sanctions, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(e), for the failure to preserve the video recording; and the decision not to preserve the video of the incident did not constitute spoliation. Defendant Se rgeant Lawrence's motion to compel, 49 , seeking a Court Order requiring Plaintiff to execute medical authorization forms is dismissed as moot. Finally, Plaintiff also agreed, on the record, to execute a medical authorization form to allow counsel for the other Defendants to obtain copies of Plaintiff's medical records. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/4/2016. (jak)
January 25, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant Lawrence to ensure the presence of Jail Administrator Matt Hall, Assistant Jail Administrator Todd Harrell, and any other witnesses he wishes to present during the evidentiary hearing scheduled for Wedneday, February 3, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas, Courtroom #1C. The Craighead County Detention Facility is directed to ensure the presence of Plaintiff, along with his institutional file, at the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/25/2016. (jak)
January 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Recommended Disposition in all respects. Allen's motion for a preliminary injunction, 10 , is denied. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/7/2016. (jak)
November 5, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 partial recommended disposition. Allen may proceed with his excessive force and inadequate medical care claims against defendants Sergeant Lawrence, Nurse Lawrence, and Doe, an unknown doctor. Allen's claims against Craighea d County are dismissed without prejudice. Allen's claims against the Craighead County Detention Center and the Craighead County Sheriff's Department are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Sergeant Lawre nce and Nurse Lawrence and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Allen must file within 90 days of the entry of this Order, a motion for service containing Doe's full name and service address. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/5/2015. (jak)
September 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to add Nurse Lawrence and John Doe, unknown doctor, as Defendants to this lawsuit, 8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/24/2015. (jak)
August 26, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing Plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days of the entry of this Order. If plaintiff does not do so, the case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an IFP application, along with a prison calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/26/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Marquell Deshun Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?