Liscomb v. Yates et al

Plaintiff: Blake Liscomb
Defendant: Jeff Yates and Dale Freeman
Case Number: 3:2015cv00280
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing the 9/25/2017 jury trial from the Court's docket. The parties are directed to submit a motion to dismiss when the settlement is final. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/14/2017. (jak)
September 13, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to dismiss. All claims except the plaintiff's claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act and the Arkansas Minimum Wage Act for overtime, fees, and costs, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/13/2017. (jak)
August 29, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 MOTION to Quash filed by Henry Boyce. The subpoena is quashed. If the plaintiff wishes to depose Boyce, he will need to file a motion for extension of the discovery deadline to enable him to depose Boyce and state good cause for the requested extension. If that motion is granted, the deposition will need to be rescheduled for a time when Boyce is not scheduled for trial. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/2017. (jak)
January 20, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion. The present scheduling order is set aside, and this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of 4/3/2017. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liscomb v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Liscomb
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?