Addison v. Muse

Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Defendant: Kim Muse
Case Number: 3:2015cv00312
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint and amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/15/2016. (jak)
June 6, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have not consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff has requested a jury trial, and no dispositive motions have been filed, 2 , 14 , and 10 . Accordingly, this case is ready to be set for a jury trial before the Honorable D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/6/2016. (jak)
November 9, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Party. Addison's claims against Marshall are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cortez Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Muse
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?