Swink v. Does et al

Plaintiff: Eric Swink
Defendant: Does and Greene County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2015cv00316
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Swink's 2 Complaint and 5 Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2016. (jak)
October 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Swink must update his address with the Clerk of the Court and respond to the 17 Motion to Compel by 11/3/2016. If he doesn't, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/2016. (jak)
May 24, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court reopens and extends the time for service. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare new summonses for Carter and McGinnis. By 30 June 2016, the United States Marshal must serve copies of summonses, 2 Complaint, 3 Order, 5 Amended Complaint, 6 Order, and this Order on Carter and McGinnis without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Marshals should serve Carter and McGinnis either in person or by certified mail with restricted delivery and return receipt requested. And Carter and McGinnis should be served through the Greene County Detention Facility. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2016. (jak)
December 14, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Swink's claim regarding a Greene County deputy made him do a controlled buy. This claim is heck-barred and is therefore dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summonses for Carter and McGinnis and th e U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the summonses, complaint, amended complaint, and this Court's 5 November 2015 Order on Carter and McGinnis without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Clerk is directed to remove the Doe Defendants from the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
November 6, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swink v. Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Swink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?