Lane v. Jonesboro Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Todd Gregory Lane
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department and Christopher Jefferson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00332
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Lane's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2016. (jak)
April 27, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Lane to update his address with the Clerk by 27 May 2016. If he doesn't, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2016. (jak)
November 24, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Lane to pay the $400 filing and administrative fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by 28 December 2015. If he doesn't, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Court directs the Clerk to send (or re-send) Lane a copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/24/2015. (jak)
November 6, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Jonesboro Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Gregory Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?