Gray v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Defendant: Matt Hall, Brett Bently and Chasity Jackson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00343
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 8 Order judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/3/2016. (jak)
November 23, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send plaintiff an in forma pauperis application at his updated address, along with the Court's prior Order, 2 . Plaintiff is directed to pay the full $400 filing and administrative fees, or to file an applicati on to proceed in forma pauperis, no later than 30 days after this Order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Plaintiff must also file an amended complaint, containing the information requested in the Court's prior order within thirty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/23/2015. (jak)
October 29, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP Application, certificate, and calculation sheet to plaintiff. No later than thirty days from the entry date of this Order, Plaintiff must submit the full $400 filing and administrative fees or file a f ully completed and signed IFP application, along with the trust fund calculation sheet and certified, signed by an authorized official. Plaintiff must file a signed amended complaint within thirty days of the entry date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/29/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Bently
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?