Rouse v. AutoZone Stores LLC

Plaintiff: Norma Rouse
Defendant: AutoZone Stores LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00363
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 32 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Court denies all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/2/2016. (jak)
April 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/22/2016. (jak)
November 16, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. AutoZone Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Rouse
Represented By: Shannon D. Elsea(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Blake P. Swan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores LLC
Represented By: R. Porter Feild(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Eric J. Plumley(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?