Moore v. King et al

Plaintiff: Larry Lenn Moore, Jr
Defendant: Flecia Ann King, Matt Hall and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2015cv00370
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant King at her sealed private address, 19 . The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, 1 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint, and May 5, 2016 Order (Doc. 14) on her without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Defendant King's private address must be redacted from the return of service and all other public portions of the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/6/2016. (jak)
June 9, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Facility to file on or before July 11, 2016, a sealed statement containing Defendant King's last known private mailing address. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/9/2016. (jak)
May 5, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Recommended Partial Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Moore may proceed with his cruel and unusual punishment claim against defendant Felicia Ann King. Mr. Moore's claims against defendants Matt Hall and Sheriff Marty Boyd are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Ms. King and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the complain t, amended complaint, and this Order on her without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. If Ms. King is no longer a Craighead County employee, as alleged by Mr. Moore, then the individual responding to service must file a sealed state ment providing Ms. King's last known private mailing address. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/5/2016. (jak)
April 11, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for a Status Update. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/11/2016. (jak)
December 21, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel which was contained in his Amended Complaint, 6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/21/2015. (jak)
December 1, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file on or before January 4, 2016, an Amended Complaint containing the specified information in this Order. If he does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/1/2015. (jak)
November 18, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP application, along with a prison calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/18/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lenn Moore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flecia Ann King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?