Addison et al v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison, Austin Herrin and Donald Havens
Defendant: Larry Mills and Phillis Craft
Case Number: 3:2015cv00380
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference. Defendants' 28 Motion to dismiss is granted. Havens's substituted complaint and amended complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2016. (jak)
March 7, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendants Mills and Craft. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Substituted Complaint, Amended Substituted Complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/7/2016. (jak)
January 29, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reminding Havens that this case will be dismissed without prejudice if he fails to file on or before February 15, 2016, an Amended Substituted Complaint containing the specified information. The Clerk is directed to mail Havens a 1983 complaint form labeled "Substituted Amended Complaint" and another copy of the January 13, 2016 Order, 12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/29/2016. (jak)
January 10, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Herrin hasn't paid the filing fee or filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis; and the time to do so has passed. Herrin's claims are therefore dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2016. (jak)
December 4, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Plaintiff Addison has filed an IFP motion that does not contain information about the funds he has in his prisoner trust account. The Clerk is directed to send him a prisoner calculation sheet. Plaintiff Addison mu st return the completed form signed by an authorized prison official and return it to the Clerk on or before January 4, 2016. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiffs Herrin and Havens separate IFP motions and separate prisoner calculation sheets. Herrin and Havens must each file on or before January 4, 2016, separate IFP motions and separate prison calculation sheets. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/4/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison et al v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillis Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?