Coleman v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: James Coleman
Defendant: Steve Wright and C J Looney
Case Number: 3:2015cv00382
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 21 Order, this case is dismissed, without prejudice. The court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/18/2016. (jak)
March 15, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file on or before April 14, 2016, a properly complete Application and a Response to the Motion to Dismiss that includes his current mailing address. If Plaintiff does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/15/2016. (jak)
December 4, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiff to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against Defendants Wright and Looney. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendants Wright and Looney, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/4/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wright
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Looney
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?