Curtis v. Nucor Corporation

Plaintiff: Steve Curtis
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00009
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 36 Opinion and Order, Judgment is entered in favor of Nucor Corporation on the claims of Steve Curtis. The complaint of Steve Curtis is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/2017. (jak)
July 7, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for and Extension of the scheduling order deadlines. The present scheduling order is set aside, and this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of September 26, 2016. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/7/2016. (jak)
January 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss; The Clerk is directed to transfer this action immediately to the Eastern District of Arkansas. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court electronically. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 12, 2016. (rg) [Transferred from arwd on 1/13/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Nucor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: John K. Linker
Represented By: Jeff S. Mayes
Represented By: Lisa Guerra Perrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Curtis
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?