Gray v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Defendant: Jason Hall, Luke Moyer, Tracy Harris, Art Bentley and Doe
Case Number: 3:2016cv00015
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 50 the Recommendation in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Gary's claims based on his failure to comply with 44 the 11/8/2016 Order; and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/29/2016. (kdr)
November 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Gray to provide notice of his new address to the Court within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2).Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/8/2016. (jak)
October 17, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 31 Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects. Accordingly, Mr. Gray's claims against the Doe Defendant are dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to identify this defendant within the time allowed. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the Doe Defendant as a party. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/17/2016. (jak)
September 20, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in all respects the 28 Recommendation in its entirety. Mr. Gray's claims against Defendant Bentley are dismissed without prejudice, for failure to respond to a court order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendant Bentley as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/20/2016. (jak)
August 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety. Mr. Gray's claims against Defendant Harris are dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to respond to this Court's orders. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Defendant Harris as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/19/2016. (jak)
February 24, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (duplicate of docket entry 9 ). (jak) (Docket text modified on 2/24/2016.) (thd).
February 10, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Gray to inform of the Court of his new address within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/10/2016. (jak)
January 25, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP Application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP Application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/25/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?