Clayton v. Craighead County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Clayton
Defendant: Scott Dacus, Andy Allison, Matt Hall and J Hicks
Case Number: 3:2016cv00017
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/2016. (jak)
June 13, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To date, the Defendants have not notified the Court as to whether Mr. Clayton complied with the May 5 Order. Defendants have seven days to notify the Court as to whether they intend to pursue their motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/13/2016. (jak)
February 11, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Craighead County Detention Center as a Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the docket sheet to reflect this change. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/11/2016. (jak)
January 25, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP Application including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/25/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?