Haynes v. Greene County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Justin Allen Haynes
Defendant: Roy Peters and Underwood
Case Number: 3:2016cv00026
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 39 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/2016. (jak)
June 8, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Partial Recommended Disposition. Accordingly, defendant Roy Peters is dismissed without prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/8/2016. (jak)
March 16, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide an alternate address at which Defendant Peters may be served within 30 days of this order's entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/16/2016. (lej)
March 10, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Recommended Disposition. Although the RD cites to a case involving subdivisions of city government, "county jails are [also] not legal entities amendable to suit". Accordingly, the Greene County Detention Center is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/2016. (jak)
February 22, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit 7 . The Clerk shall add Roy Peters and Underwood to the docket as Defendants. Then, the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/22/2016. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Greene County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Allen Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwood
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?