Haskett et al v. Gamma Powersports et al

Plaintiff: Robert Haskett and Laura Haskett
Defendant: Gamma Powersports, Peter Ramsey, Cool Springs Rides LLC, Automatic Distributors and John Does
Case Number: 3:2016cv00047
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 MOTION to Dismiss and Western Power Sports is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Western, however, remains a crossclaim defendant pursuant to TNHD Partners' crossclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/14/2016. (jak)
August 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 , 46 , and 47 plaintiffs' motions to dismiss Gamma Powersports and Peter Ramsay, Cool Spring Rides, LLC, and Automatic Distributors. Claims against these parties are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2016. (mef)
July 21, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/21/2016. (jak)
June 21, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Gamma Powersports, Peter Ramsay, or both of them have an objection to the motion to withdraw, 18 , they should file their objection with the Clerk of Court within thirty days from the entry of this Order. If they do not have an objections, Gamma Powersports must have new counsel enter an appearance within thirty days from the entry of this Order. Ramsay must within thirty days of this Order either have new counsel enter an appearance or give notice that he intends to proceed pro se. I f both parties fail to respond to this Order within thirty days, a default judgment may be entered against them. Gamma Powersports and Peter Ramsay must file an answer to the amended complaint by August 4, 2016. The Court directs Sarah Cullen to serve a copy of this Order on Gamma Powersports and Peter Ramsay immediately and file a certificate of service stating the date on which she served them and the means used to accomplish that service. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/2016. (jak)
June 3, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2016. (jak)
May 17, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Hasketts filed suit more than 90 days ago. The docket shows no service on Cool Springs Rides. The Court will dismiss the claims against Cool Springs Rides without prejudice unless the Hasketts show timely service or seek some other relief by 27 May 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskett et al v. Gamma Powersports et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Haskett
Represented By: Melody H. Piazza(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Haskett
Represented By: Melody H. Piazza(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamma Powersports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Springs Rides LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?