Smith v. US Department of Education et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Smith
Defendant: US Department of Education, Brian Beers and Phillip Carter
Case Number: 3:2016cv00089
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must draw, at random, another Judge to screen all of Smith's current and future proposed filings, as well as to handle any matter in any of Smith's closed cases that were assigned to me. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/8/2016. (jak)
September 23, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion. The Court directs the Clerk not to file any papers from Smith in any of his closed cases, and not to file any new case from Smith, without prior approval from the Court. The exception: Smith may file a notice of appeal, and appeal-related papers, in these two cases. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/2016. (jak)
August 31, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Vacate and alternative motion to stay. Second motion o vacate, and embedded motion to recuse, 10 , in case No. 3:16-cv-163, denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2016. (jak)
August 17, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Vacate. The Court admonishes Smith against filing any more motions in this closed case. His potential remedy, if one remains, is through appeal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2016. (jak)
May 24, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. US Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?