Sims v. King et al

Plaintiff: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Defendant: King, Matthew Hall and Doe
Case Number: 3:2016cv00099
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to adopt the 60 Motion for Summary Judgment and related pleadings filed by Defendant Matthew Hall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/31/2017. (jak)
July 26, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 50 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Sims' claims against the Doe defendant are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/26/2017. (jak)
March 30, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Sims to provide a name for the Doe defendant, along with a short statement of Doe's involvement in the alleged violations. Sims' failure to do so within 30 days will result in the recommended dismissal of his claims against Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 3/30/2017. (jak)
January 30, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 and 27 Motions for Service. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a summons for King and Felicia King, and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the summons, 2 Complaint, 7 Addendum, and 10 Amended Complaint upon them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Service for Felicia King should be at the addresses provided under seal in case number 3:15-cv-00370, Doc. No. 27. Service for King should be attempted at Tiger Correctional Services. Sims' 28 Motion for an order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/30/2017. (jak)
June 14, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP application to Sims. Sims is directed to submit the $350 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Sims' failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/14/2016. (jak)
May 25, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Sims to file an amended complaint with the information previously requested. Sims' failure to do so within fourteen days will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. The Clerk is directed to send Sims a copy of the Court's April 18, 2016 Order, 3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/25/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Shawgnessy Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?