McFarland v. Nestle USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Joy McFarland
Defendant: Nestle USA Inc and Nestle Prepared Foods Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00100
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay deadlines pending mediation. By 1/27/2017 the parties must either inform the Court that this matter has been settled or inform the Court that further negotiations would not be productive. The parties will then file their Rule 26(f) report within 7 days after the stay is lifted and defendants will file their response to the motion to certify class within 14 days after the stay is lifted. The Court will enter its final scheduling order after the Rule 26(f) report is filed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/2016. (jak)
November 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 19 Motion to Extend the stay. The stay is extended up to and including 12/12/2016. Should the parties be unable to settle this matter by 12/12/2016, they must either file a status report and request an extension of stay if settle ment is feasible or inform the Court that further negotiations would not be productive. If they determine that further negotiations would not be productive, the parties must file their Rule 26(f) report within seven days after the stay is lifted, and the defendants must file a response to the plaintiff's motion to certify class within fourteen days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/2016. (jak)
September 9, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend the stay. The stay is extended up to and including 10/10/2016. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/9/2016. (jak)
August 16, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay deadlines. The existing deadlines are hereby stayed, including the deadlines for the defendants to respond to the Plaintiff's motion to certify class, the parties' Rule 26 conference, and the submission of a joint preliminary planning report. This stay will be in effect through 9/9/2016. Should the parties be unable to settle this matter by then, they must either file a status report and request an extension of the stay if settlement is feasible or in form the Court that further negotiations would not be productive. In the latter event, the parties must submit their Rule 26(f) report within seven days after the stay is lifted, and defendants must file a response to the plaintiff's motion to certify class within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/16/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Nestle USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy McFarland
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA Inc
Represented By: O. John Norris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Prepared Foods Company
Represented By: O. John Norris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?