Grewal et al v. Hira et al

Plaintiff: Jasdeep Singh Grewal, Manmohan Singh Bhamra and Jasbir Singh
Defendant: Harminder Singh Hira and JJB&H Hotels LLC
Counter_claimant: JJB&H Hotels LLC and Harminder Singh Hira
Counter_defendant: Manmohan Singh Bhamra, Jasdeep Singh Grewal and Jasbir Singh
Case Number: 3:2016cv00101
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have notified the Court that this case has been settled. This action including all claims by the plaintiffs and all counterclaims asserted by the defendants is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2018. (jak)
April 25, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that the bench trial will begin at 1:30 p.m. on 5/14/2018 in Courtroom #324, E.C. "Took" Gathings Federal Courthouse, 615 South Main Street in Jonesboro, Arkansas. Counsel and parties should be present by 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2018. (jak)
March 12, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2018. (jak)
March 1, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has determined that the bench trial of this matter scheduled for the week of 3/12/2018 should be continued due to the Court's schedule. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/2018. (jak)
December 18, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to extend deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to 1/29/2018 and the motion deadline is extended to 2/12/2018. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/18/2017. (jak)
February 21, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2017. (jak)
January 30, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a notice with whatever specific information deemed appropriate about the Das family members' role in the parties' dispute and this case. The information will help decide, before the case move into the merits, whether any impartiality might reasonable be questioned regarding the recusal issue. Notice due by 2/15/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grewal et al v. Hira et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasdeep Singh Grewal
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manmohan Singh Bhamra
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasbir Singh
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harminder Singh Hira
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJB&H Hotels LLC
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JJB&H Hotels LLC
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Harminder Singh Hira
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Manmohan Singh Bhamra
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jasdeep Singh Grewal
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jasbir Singh
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?