Mitchell v. Brown

Plaintiff: Ronald Mitchell
Defendant: Leonard Brown, Mandy and Chatman
Case Number: 3:2016cv00103
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 48 Order, this case is dismissed. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2017. (jak)
December 6, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 36 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Mitchell's 26 motion for partial summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/6/2016. (jak)
November 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Mitchell to notify the Court of his new address within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this lawsuit under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/22/2016. (jak)
October 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety. Defendants' 19 Motion for summary judgment based on failure to exhaust administrative remedies is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/25/2016. (jak)
June 30, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the partial recommended disposition filed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere; Mr. Mitchell's claims against defendant Chatman are dismissed without prejudice 11 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/16. (tjb)
April 20, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mitchell to file an amended complaint in thirty days. His failure to comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of his deliberate-indifference claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/20/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?