Allyn v. Woolard et al
Plaintiff: |
Nina Allyn |
Defendant: |
Barbara Woolard and Department of Agriculture |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00115 |
Filed: |
April 26, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Clay |
Presiding Judge: |
D. P. Marshall |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2017 |
Filing
53
JUDGMENT: The Court quiets title in this parcel in Leone Johnson and Nina Allyn as tenants in common. During her lifetime, Nina Allyn has all the rights and duties of a co-tenant. Nina Allyn is entitled to one-half of the current farm payment due to the owners from the US Department of Agriculture when that payment is made in the fall of 2017. Nina Allyn shall have judgment against Barbara Woolard for $7,035.06. This judgment shall bear post-judgment interest at 1.23% per annum from today until paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2017. (jak)
|
June 12, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the end of the bench trial today, the Court rules in favor of Allyn. Joint report confirming numbers, and requesting any costs, due by 6/16/2017. The Court will enter judgment in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2017. (jak)
|
October 12, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss with a caveat. The caveat is on any past payments. Recovery of any of these would be monetary damages, which would be beyond the immunity waiver and the extraordinary writ. Allyn requests an embargo on payments d uring the litigation but she hasn't demonstrated her entitlement to that by way of injunctive relief or otherwise. Finally, the court wonders whether Johnson needs to be joined to quiet title among all interested parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2016. (jak)
|
August 2, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER: Update of Woolard, 8 -1, noted and appreciated. The Court directs the Clerk to docket Woolard's answer as a separate entry. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/2/2016. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?