Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works Inc v. Houston et al

Plaintiff: Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works Inc
Defendant: Timothy B Houston, Electro Design Enginerring Inc and Celeta Stripling
Case Number: 3:2016cv00134
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court can handle this dispute on the papers. The proposed joint letter is a good start, and the Court confirms its bench ruling that the letter should come from all counsel. It needs two tweaks and some additional information, though, to b e fair to EDE, Stripling, and Houston, who objected to these subpoenas. The Court could have, and should have, been clearer from the bench about the subpoenas. They're from Tri-State, not all the parties. Discovery disputes, 49 and 52 , addressed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2017. (jak)
May 11, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting 49 Tri-State's report of discovery dispute. The Court directs Tri-State to review the Scheduling Order about discovery disputes, 15 at 3. The Court directs EDE, Stripling, and Houston to respond to 49 in a joint paper by 5/17 /2017, guided by the limitations in the Scheduling Order. After receiving that response, the Court will decide if a hearing is necessary. Counsel should also inform chambers if they're available for a 10:30 a.m. hearing in Jonesboro on 5/24/2017 if one is needed. 50 Motion granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2017. (jak)
April 7, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER addressing Joint Reports 22 & 28 . Simultaneous supplemental production, as approved on the record, due by 5/8/2017. 31 Motion to Amend is granted in part and denied in part. New defamation claims against new defendants would further comp licate an already tangled dispute. All other proposed amendments approved. Clean copy of the amended complaint, reflecting the Court's limitation, due by 4/14/2017. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/2017. (jak)
February 28, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Tri-State hasn't served the disputed subpoenas yet, then it should not do so until the Court resolves the parties' dispute. Simultaneous five-page briefs with attachments due by 5:00 p.m. tomorrow, 3/1/2017. The Court encourages counsel to do two things: cooperate more; and follow the Court's 15 Scheduling Order, about how to bring discovery disputes to the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2017. (jak)
January 3, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/3/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works Inc v. Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works Inc
Represented By: Shawn R. Lillie
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy B Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Design Enginerring Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Puryear
Represented By: Ariel J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeta Stripling
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Puryear
Represented By: Ariel J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?