Grant v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: Alonzo Tyrone Grant
Defendant: David Carter, Mike Ryles, Randy Sipes and Tony Charles Roe
Case Number: 3:2016cv00180
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Grant's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2017. (jak)
December 5, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Reopen case. The Court directs the Clerk to lift the stay and reopen the case. The Court needs to know how Grant's state case was resolved in order to screen his complaint. Grant must therefore file a status report or a copy of the state court disposition by 1/5/2017. If he doesn't then his case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2016. (jak)
August 16, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Grant must pay the filing fee over time. The Court won't assess an initial partial filing fee but Grant's custodian must collect monthly payments from Grant's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the $350 fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Sheriff of the Greene County Detention Center. Grant's motion to appoint counsel is denied witho ut prejudice as premature. This case is stayed pending disposition of Grant's state case. Grant can move to reopen the case after final disposition of his state case, including any appeal. If Grant doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or a status report by 8/16/2017, then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2016. (jak)
July 29, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court directs the Clerk to send Grant another application to proceed in forma pauperis. Grant has until 8/29/2016 to submit the completed application and certified calculation sheet. If he doesn't, then his case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Greene County Sheriff. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Tyrone Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ryles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Charles Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?