Callies v. Crittenden County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Gary Callies
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2016cv00201
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 20 Recommendation in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Callies may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Myleo, Coleman, and Nurse Mandy in their individual capacities only. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Myleo, Coleman, and Nurse Mandy and forward it to the U.S. Marshal for service of the summons, substituted complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Callies's official claim against Myleo, Coleman, and Nurse Mandy is dismissed without prejudice. Callies's claim against the CCDC is dismissed with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/23/2017. (jak)
October 17, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff must file on or before 11/16/2016 a statement indicating his desire to continue with this lawsuit and a signed and fully completed freeworld Application to Proceed IFP. If plaintiff does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/17/2016. (jak)
August 29, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion on or before 9/29/2016. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an IFP application, along with a prison calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/29/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callies v. Crittenden County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Callies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?