Angel v. Jonesboro Police Department

Plaintiff: Micah Angel
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department
Case Number: 3:2016cv00203
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter from Ms. Angel. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Angel another copy of the 11 Order and the accompanying Judgments, 12 in case no. 3:16-cv-203, 7 in case no. 3:16-cv-204, and 7 in case no. 3:16-cv-205. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/17/2016. (jak)
October 5, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/5/2016. (jak)
August 17, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel v. Jonesboro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?