Downwind LLC et al v. United States Department of Energy et al

Plaintiff: Downwind LLC and Golden Bridge LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Energy, Ernest Moniz, Southwestern Power Administration and Scott Carpenter
Movant: Plains & Eastern Clean Line Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00207
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 91 Court of Appeals' mandate, the 85 Judgment is vacated, and the amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2018. (jak)
December 21, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The amended complaint's condemnation-related claims, counts three and five, are dismissed without prejudice. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/21/2017. (jak)
November 8, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes James DuBois, Stephen Finn, Reade Wilson, Joseph Nelson, and Cary Kottler to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 11/14/2017 for oral argument in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/8/2017. (jak)
June 8, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 56 conditional request for a prompt hearing on record issues noted. 50 Motion to make various corrections and supplement the voluminous record is granted. Corrected and supplemental materials due in electronic form by 6/15/2017 and in pape r form by 6/23/2017. 51 Motion is denied. The Court's 45 Amended Final Scheduling Order is clarified: Downwind's motion for judgment and opening brief are due by 7/17/2017; Defendants' and Intervenor's responses and cross moti ons are due 30 days afterwards; 30 days later Downwind's reply and responses to any cross motions are due; and Defendants and the Intervenor have 15 days thereafter to reply on the cross motions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2017. (jak)
February 7, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/2017. (jak)
February 1, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' proposed protective order. The Court's requested changes are noted on the attachment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2017. (jak)
November 7, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Intervene. The motion was timely; independent federal question jurisdiction exists; and Clean Line's defenses raise questions of law and fact already in play. Clean Line should file its answer by 11/14/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/7/2016. (jak)
August 22, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/22/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downwind LLC et al v. United States Department of Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Downwind LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Travis
Represented By: Jordan P. Wimpy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Bridge LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Travis
Represented By: Jordan P. Wimpy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: James J. DuBois
Represented By: Stephen Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Moniz
Represented By: James J. DuBois
Represented By: Stephen Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Power Administration
Represented By: James J. DuBois
Represented By: Stephen Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Carpenter
Represented By: James J. DuBois
Represented By: Stephen Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Plains & Eastern Clean Line Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?