Wesby v. Globe Manufacturing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Damien Wesby
Defendant: Globe Manufacturing Company LLC and John Does
Case Number: 3:2016cv00235
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER directing the Clerk to tax $22,681.66 against Wesby for Globe and $26,377.45 against Casco for Wesby. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2019. (jak)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 120 Motion for costs. Partly granting and partly denying 121 Motion for costs. Denying 121 Motion to alter or amend the judgment and denying 127 Motion for new trial. The Court will enter a separate order soon with the details about costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2019. (jak)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER pursuant to Amended General Order 54, the Court authorizes Cameron Watson, Kevin Bernstein, Brian Brooks, and Josh Moore to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Jonesboro Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse on 7/8/2019 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2019. (jak)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT: Wesby's claims against the John Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The Court enters judgment on the verdict for Damien Wesby against Casco Industries, Inc. for $937,500. Both of Wesby's claims against Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Wesby is also entitled to costs as allowed by law, which the Court may later award. Any motion for costs due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2019. (cmn)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Robin Tittle and Patricia Freeman to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Jonesboro Federal Building on April 8, 2019 through April 12, 2019, for the trial in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/8/2019. (jak)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Jennifer W. FitzGerald to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant in to the Jonesboro Federal Building on 4/8/2019 through 4/12/2019 for the trial in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2019. (jak)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion in limine. 52 Motion in limine is denied with directions, 53 Motion in limine is denied, and 54 Motion in llimine is denied with instructions. The parties may file lists of proposed voir di re topics by 3/25/2019. And they must file a joint report on witnesses, with projected examination times, by 3/27/2019. All claims against the John Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2019. (jak)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The Court sets a pretrial for both of these cases for 10:30 a.m. on 3/20/2019 in Jonesboro Courtroom 324. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/2019. (jak)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' work on the proposed protective order. Final edits attached. Please submit a revised version to chambers for entry. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2017. (jak)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court declines to enter the parties' proposed protective order. Please review some acceptable orders and submit another proposal. Joint report, No. 16 , addressed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/23/2017. (jak)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice 14 MOTION for Protective Order. Please follow the procedure outlined in the Final Scheduling Order, 12 at 3, for discovery disputes. The parties are directed to not submit competing orders. An agreed proposed order is best; but if one cannot be agreed upon, then please follow the discovery-dispute procedure on that issue too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesby v. Globe Manufacturing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Wesby
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Peter Byron Gee, Jr.
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By: Kevin D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?