Bills v. Bradley

Plaintiff: Clester Bills
Defendant: John Bradley
Case Number: 3:2016cv00248
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Bills must pay the filing fee, but over time. His current custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Bills's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court unti l the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Sheriff of Mississippi County. This case is stayed pending disposition of plaintiff's state court case. Any motion to reopen must be file d within 60 days of the final disposition of the state case. If Bills doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or a status report by 10/20/2017, then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/2016. (jak)
October 18, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2016. (jak)
September 20, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Bills to either pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 10/20/2016. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Bills an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/20/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bills v. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clester Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?