Aikens v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory Gene Aikens |
Defendant: |
David Carter, Allison Huckabee, Blain Cagle and Heather Glover |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00267 |
Filed: |
September 29, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Greene |
Presiding Judge: |
Jerome T. Kearney |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian S. Miller |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 19, 2017 |
Filing
49
JUDGMENT pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/19/2017. (jak)
|
September 13, 2017 |
Filing
42
ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/13/2017. (jak)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to 28 Motion to Compel within 15 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) and/or FED.R.CIV.P. 37(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/13/2017. (jak)
|
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER adopting in all respects the 12 partial recommended disposition; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff Gregory Gene Aikens's legal claim for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and dismissing without prejudice defendants David Carter and Allison Huckabee for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/27/2016. (ljb)
|
November 10, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER finding that service is appropriate for Defendants Blain Cagle and Heather Glover. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the US Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the 10 Amended Complaint and summons on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/10/2016. (jak)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall submit either the $400 filing fee or a completed IFP application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff an in for ma pauperis application and calculation sheet. The Clerk also shall forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Greene County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/5/2016. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?