BMO Harris Bank NA v. RAD Transportation LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Defendant: RAD Transportation LLC and Charles S Bright
Case Number: 3:2016cv00272
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ON WRITS OF GARNISHMENTS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2018. (jak)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion. The Court will sign and file the agreed Order to resolve all the parties' pending disputes. The Court congratulates the parties on their settlement. 56 Joint report of discovery dispute denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2018. (jak)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying without prejudice 52 Oral Motion for a creditor's bill. If it turns out that BMO Harris needs a creditor's bill as the Court is deciding this case, then the bank may renew its motion at the bench trial. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2018. (jak)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 38 Karla Bright's objections construed as a motion to intervene. BMO Harris's 44 Third Party Complaint is re-designated as a cross-claim. The Clerk should update the docket. 41 Motion to Dismiss and 46 Objections are denied without prejudice as moot. The Court will hold a bench trial on all disputed issues on 10/1/2018. Until then, Wagner's installment payments should be deposited into the registry of this Court. A Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/7/2018. (jak)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT for BMO Harris Bank NA and against RAD Transportation LLC and Charles S. Bright jointly and severally, for $392,374.90, plus an attorney's fee of $2,500.00. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 1.06% from today until this Judgment is paid in full. 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/2017. (jak)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court needs more information from BMO Harris Bank before it can decide the motion for default judgment. Addendum due by 2/17/2017. RAD has filed an untimely answer, but no response to the motion. RAD needs to do two things: response to the motion, and either move to answer out of time, or explain why its answer was timely. RAD's paper due by 3/3/2017. If RAD remains silent, the Court will strike its answer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/9/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank NA v. RAD Transportation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Thomas G. Berndsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAD Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?