Peden v. Mills et al
Plaintiff: Carey Wayne Peden
Defendant: Poinsett County Jail, Larry Mills and Mike Kendall
Case Number: 3:2016cv00280
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT pursuant to the Order filed this date, Judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/10/2017. (jak)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of Defendant Mike Kindall. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a summons for Kindall, and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the summons, 2 Complaint, and this Order upon Kindall at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/30/2017. (jak)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Larry Mills, Poinsett County Sheriff, to file under seal, no later than 30 days after this Order's entry date, Kendall's last known address, or to state if Kendall has not been an employee at the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/26/2017. (jak)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting 6 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Carey Wayne Peden's claims against the Poinsett County Jail are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/20/2016. (jak)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to Peden. No later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order, Peden must submit the ful l $400 filing and administrative fees, or file a fully completed and signed IFP application. Failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of the complaint. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/14/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peden v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Wayne Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?