Anderson v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Anderson
Defendant: Johnathan Cook, Blain Cagle, Justin Hollins and Allison York-Huckabee
Case Number: 3:2016cv00304
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT pursuant to 11 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/24/2017. (jak)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff' ;s prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the total $350 has been paid. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Greene County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/16/2016. (jak)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application within 30 days from the entry date of this Order. The Cler k shall send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet. The Clerk shall also forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Greene County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison York-Huckabee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?