Elliott v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Kevin Elliott
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2016cv00324
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion for Costs. If the $400 filing fee has not been reimbursed to date, the fee shall be paid by the judgment fund administered by the United States Treasury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/4/2018. (jak)
April 20, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $2,694.02 in fees/expenses and $400 in costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/20/2018. (jak)
February 8, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 12 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that the final decision of the Commissioner is reversed, and this case is remanded for proceedings specified in the Court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/8/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Elliott
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?