Johnson v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: Dell Cook and Luke Whitfield
Case Number: 3:2017cv00041
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT pursuant to 64 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/2/2018. (jak)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER adopting 28 Recommended Partial Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff is hereby allowed to proceed against defendants Chief Dell Cook and Lieutenant Luke Whitfield with his 1983 inhumane conditio ns of confinement and state law negligence claims arising from his alleged exposure to mold, mildew, and rust. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/16/2018. (jak)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Exhaustion of Remedies as premature and denying 44 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/14/2017. (jak)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Cook and Whitfield at the Mississippi County Detention Center. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, and this Order on Cook and Whitfield without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/12/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?