Brooks v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Jeremie Brooks
Defendant: Susan Cox, Becky Hicks, Kim Muse, Poinsett County Detention Center, Does and Steve Rorex
Case Number: 3:2017cv00055
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT: Brooks' s claim against the Poinsett County Detention Center is dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2018. (jak)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to 22 Motion to Dismiss within 15 days of the date of this Order. Defendants' request to extend time to file a summary judgment motion, pending resolution of their 22 Motion to Dismiss, is granted. The Court will set a new dispositive motions deadline following resolution of the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/26/2018. (jak)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant Hicks and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the 2 Complaint and summons on Defendant Hicks without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/29/2017. (jak)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting 7 recommendation as modified. Brooks's claims against Cox, Muse, and the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. And his claim against the Poinsett County Detention Center is dismissed with prejudice. Liberally construing Brooks's complaint, he's stated a deliberate indifference claim against Captain Hicks. That claim therefore survives screening too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2017. (jak)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant Rorex and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the 4 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/8/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremie Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?