Monroe v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Seth Monroe
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Does, Frank Jeff, Avery Burnett, James Teague, Mike Lawrence, Sean Calavay and Casey Foster
Case Number: 3:2017cv00074
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/7/2018. (jak)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing complete responses to defendants' discovery requests due by 2/28/2018. If Monroe doesn't comply with this Order or otherwise respond, then the Court will dismiss his case without prejudice. The Defendants should file prompt notice about Monroe's compliance. 25 Motion to compel granted with instructions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2018. (jak)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: 22 Motion for copies granted and otherwise denied. The Court directs the Clerk to mail copies of No. 1 , 2 , 4 , 5 , 6 , 8 , 10 , 17 , 21 , & 22 to Monroe's current address. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to redesignate this case as a 440 civil rights case. Monroe's 5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Monroe is directed to file a second amended complaint by 7/5/2017. If Monroe does not clear up his allegations by then, the Court will dismiss his case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/2017. (jak)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Monroe to either pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 5/12/2017. Monroe must file an amended complaint by 5/12/2017. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Monroe a blank 1983 Complaint form and an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Calavay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?