Holyoke Mutual Insurance Co v. East Arkansas Area Agency on Aging et al
Plaintiff: Holyoke Mutual Insurance Co
Defendant: East Arkansas Area Agency on Aging and Cynthia Underwood
Case Number: 3:2017cv00083
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: The Court belatedly notes the parties' December 2018 joint status report, 65 . It is appreciated. Please file another joint status report on state court proceedings by 8/30/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2019. (jak)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion. 44 Amended Final Scheduling Order suspended. The case is stayed and administratively terminated. Status report due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2018. (jak)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 37 Motion. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/16/2018. The Court emphasizes no further extensions will be granted in this aging case absent extraordinary circumstances. 41 Joint Motion granted. an Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2018. (jak)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER reopening and extending the time for service until 8/31/2017. 23 Motion for belated extension is granted as modified. The 25 Second Motion to dismiss is denied with a carve out. The Agency's charitable immunity is one of the deep issues in the case. The Court still doesn't have enough information to rule on that issue. The Agency may press this defense in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/5/2018. (jak)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holyoke Mutual Insurance Co v. East Arkansas Area Agency on Aging et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holyoke Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Destiny Lynn McHughes
Represented By: Josh E. McHughes
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Arkansas Area Agency on Aging
Represented By: Michael McCarty Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Underwood
Represented By: Michael McCarty Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?