Brooks v. Rorex et al
Plaintiff: Jeremie M Brooks
Defendant: Steve Rorex, Becky Hitts, Kim Muse and Larry Mill
Case Number: 3:2017cv00085
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 30 Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed without prejudice; this action is terminated; and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/2017. (mef)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file on or before 9/25/2017 a Notice containing his current mailing address and a statement indicating his desire to continue with this lawsuit and a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/25/2017. (jak)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendant Kim Muse at her sealed private mailing address, 15 . The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, and 6 Order on Defendant Muse without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Defendant Muse's private mailing address must be redacted from the return of service and all other public portions of the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/15/2017. (jak)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Defendants to file on or before 8/22/2017, a sealed statement providing Defendant Muse's last known private mailing address. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/14/2017. (jak)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Brooks may proceed with his inhumane conditions of confinement and inadequate medical care claims against Rorex, Muse, Hitts, and Mills. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Rorex, Muse, Hitts, and Mills. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, and this Order on them without prepayments of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/30/2017. (jak)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Brooks to file an Amended Complaint on or before 5/29/2017 containing the information specified in this Order. If Brooks does not timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5 (c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/28/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Rorex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremie M Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?