Shipman v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Shipman
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, K Bowers and Mitts
Case Number: 3:2017cv00099
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT pursuant to 36 Order, Shipman's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/21/2018. (jak)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting 16 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings. Plaintiff Shipman's claims against separate defendant nurse Mitts are dismissed without prejudice, 1 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/3/2018. (jak)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting 5 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in all respects. The Court dismisses without prejudice Mr. Shipman's 1983 claims against separate defendant Craighead County Detention Center. Mr. Shipman's claims against separate defendants K Bowers and Mitts remain pending. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/18/2017. (jak)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide any known address for Mitts no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. If Plaintiff fails to do so, his claims against Mitts may be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/17/2017. (jak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail an IFP application along with a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff must return the completed application including an accompanying calculation sheet and certificate signed by an authorized official, or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Otherwise, the lawsuit will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/5/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipman v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?