Sparks v. Gibson
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Sparks
Defendant: L D Gibson
Case Number: 3:2017cv00100
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Sparks's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/18/2017. (jak)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Sparks must pay the filing fee, but over time. The Court won't assess an initial partial filing fee but his custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Sparks's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Sheriff. This case is stayed. Sparks can move to reopen this case afte r final disposition of his state case, including any appeal. If Spark's doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or a status report by 6/28/2018 then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2017. (jak)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Sparks a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis along with a copy of this Order. Sparks must submit the completed application by 6/26/2017. If he doesn't, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L D Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?