Bills v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Clester Bills
Defendant: Welirn Richardson and Cindy Thyer
Case Number: 3:2017cv00113
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT consistent with the Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/6/2017. (jak)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to Plaintiff. Plaintiff must submit the full $400 filin g and administrative fees, or file a fully completed and signed in forma pauperis application, along with the trust fund calculation sheet and certificate, signed by an authorized official no later than 30 days from the entry date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/2017. (jak)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/2017. (jak)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Bills didn't pay the $400 filing and docketing fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. If he doesn't do one or the other by 6/27/2017, then his case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to send Bills a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and certified calculation sheet with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bills v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clester Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welirn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Thyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?